THE KILDARE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide financial support to charities within the Worcestershire area
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 27 July 2012: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Geoffrey Probert | Trustee | 09 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
IAN JAMES CROCKATT SMITH | Trustee | 21 March 2017 |
|
|||||
ANTHONY NIMROD CHAMPION | Trustee | 13 July 2012 |
|
|
||||
DAWN EMMA OLIVER | Trustee | 13 July 2012 |
|
|
||||
MARTIN NEEDHAM | Trustee | 13 July 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.72m | £22.61k | £4.93m | £5.36m | £415.18k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.08m | £1.48m | £617.39k | £4.23m | £4.39m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £2.70m | N/A | £4.91m | £5.18m | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £23.34k | N/A | £23.57k | £184.56k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | N/A | £4.91m | £5.18m | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £1.08m | N/A | £617.39k | £4.23m | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £20.79k | N/A | £8.91k | £5.70k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £1.06m | N/A | £608.47k | £4.22m | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 30 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 30 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 06 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 06 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 22 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 22 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 26 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 13 September 2021 | 220 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 13 September 2021 | 220 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 28 DEC 2011
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES SHALL HOLD THE CAPITAL AND INCOME OF THE TRUST FUND UPON TRUST TO APPLY THE INCOME, AND ALL OR SUCH PART OR PARTS OF THE CAPITAL, AT SUCH TIME OR TIMES AND IN SUCH MANNER TO, OR FOR THE BENEFIT OF, SUCH EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE OBJECTS AND PURPOSES IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY IN THEIR DISCRETION THINK FIT
Contact information
- Address:
-
c/o PEAR TREE COTTAGE
YARRINGTON ROAD
ALFRICK
WORCESTER
WR6 5EX
- Phone:
- 07812743485
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window