THE ALEXANDRIA TRUST

Charity Number: 1146025
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The objects of the Charity are the advancement of education and the promotion of learning and research for the public benefit, primarily in (but not limited to) the social sciences.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £189,076
Total expenditure: £176,496

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
Where the charity operates:
  • Kensington And Chelsea

Governance

Registration history:
  • 21 February 2012: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Wail Benjelloun Chair 11 June 2019
None on record
NADIA MOSTAFA KAMAL MOHAMED ELGOWELY Trustee 15 February 2024
None on record
Marlene Johnson Trustee 04 August 2021
None on record
Thomas Connor Trustee 27 April 2021
None on record
Hazem Fathelbab Galal Fathelbab Trustee 23 April 2015
None on record
Haifa Reda Jamalallail Trustee 24 March 2014
None on record
Dr HEBA RAOUF MOHAMED EZZAT Trustee 03 February 2012
None on record
Salah Khalil Trustee 22 December 2011
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £693.40k £444.90k £505.11k £210.29k £189.08k
Total expenditure £637.80k £480.20k £402.86k £376.12k £176.50k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £693.36k N/A £505.11k N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £0 N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £0 N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income - Investment £35 N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income - Other £0 N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £0 N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £637.80k N/A £402.86k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £2.92k N/A £7.75k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A £0 N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 04 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 04 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 15 September 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 15 September 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 28 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 28 September 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 18 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 18 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 31 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 31 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Flat 17
Madison Apartments
17 Wyfold Road
LONDON
SW6 6SE
Phone:
07828658139