THE VETERANS FUND

Charity Number: 1148106
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To organise and manage the UK Armed Forces Day events over the week-end in Southport. To raise funds and disburse funds for the benefit of UK Armed Forces veterans who find themselves in need of charitable assistance. Please note that The Veterans Fund ceased operations with effect from 13th August 2015

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2014

Total income: £6,712
Total expenditure: £4,239

Fundraising

This charity raises funds from the public but does not work with commercial participators.

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Disability
  • Armed Forces/emergency Service Efficiency
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Lancashire
  • Liverpool City
  • Sefton

Governance

Registration history:
  • 13 July 2012: Standard registration
  • 11 September 2015: Removed (Ceased to exist)
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/12/2013 31/12/2014
Total gross income £5.18k £6.71k
Total expenditure £6.34k £4.24k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2014 30 April 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2014 Not Required
Annual return 30 December 2013 09 January 2015 71 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 December 2013 Not Required