HELP IS AT HAND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Help with reducing poverty and put children through education in India. Build water wells for clean water and any other means to helps
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2021
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England
- India
Governance
- 24 April 2012: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ahmed Ismail Patel | Chair | 02 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Soyeb Patel | Trustee | 02 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
MOHAMMED BILAL NADAT | Trustee | 02 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
DAWOOD PATEL | Trustee | 02 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
FARUK ADAM | Trustee | 11 January 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.15k | £18.74k | £6.17k | £2.00k | £1.21k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £5.08k | £31.08k | £7.69k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 193 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 193 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 559 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 559 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 24 December 2022 | 54 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 26 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 26 April 2021 | 177 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01 JAN 2012
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE FINANCIAL HARDSHIP EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY BY MAKING GRANTS OR MONEY FOR PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR ITEMS SERVICES OR FACILITIES. TO PROMOTE ANY OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSE IN FURTHERANCE OF THE OBJECTS AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
17 Warwick Gardens
ILFORD
IG1 4LE
- Phone:
- 07763852992
- Email:
- faruk_adam@yahoo.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window