Governing document BIG LOCAL TRUST

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 13 FEB 2012 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 22 JUN 2012 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 05 JUN 2013 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 23 JUL 2018 as amended on 24 Sep 2021
Charitable objects
5.1. THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY (A) THE ADVANCEMENT OF COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT; AND (B) THE RELIEF OF UNEMPLOYMENT FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, IN PARTICULAR, BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION, IN THE LOCALITIES IN EACH REGION SPECIFIED IN SCHEDULE 6. 5.2. THE OBJECTS ARE TO BE ACHIEVED IN PARTICULAR, BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION (C) BY MAKING DISTRIBUTIONS TO RECIPIENTS; AND (D) CONDUCTING RESEARCH AND DISSEMINATING THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH. 5.3. THE DISTRIBUTUONS REFERRED TO IN CLAUSE 5.2. SHOULD BE MADE SO AS TO DEVELOP THE CAPACITY AND SKILLS OF THE MEMBERS OF SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITIES, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, IN SUCH A WAY THAT THEY ARE BETTER ABLE: (E) TO IDENTIFY, AND HELP MEET THEIR NEEDS; AND (F) TO PARTICIPATE MORE FULLY IN SOCIETY.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.