BARROW-UPON-HUMBER CIVIC SOCIETY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
- North Lincolnshire
Governance
- 18 June 1973: Standard registration
- 09 September 2009: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2004 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2004 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 24 MAY 1973.
Charitable objects
(A) TO STIMULATE PUBLIC INTEREST IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT. (B) TO PROMOTE HIGH STANDARDS OF PLANNING AND ARCHITECTURE IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT. (C) TO SECURE THE PRESERVATION PROTECTION DEVELOPMENT AND IMPROVEMENT OF FEATURES OF HISTORIC OF PUBLIC INTEREST IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT.
Area of benefit
BARROW-UPON-HUMBER BARROW HAVEN AND NEW HOLLAND.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window