Accounts and annual returns YORK WAY MASJID AND COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity number: 1151255
Charity reporting is overdue by 1731 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 November 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 270 days
Accounts and TAR 01 November 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 270 days
Annual return 01 November 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 636 days
Accounts and TAR 01 November 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 636 days
Annual return 01 November 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1001 days
Accounts and TAR 01 November 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1001 days
Annual return 01 November 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1366 days
Accounts and TAR 01 November 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1366 days
Annual return 01 November 2019 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1731 days
Accounts and TAR 01 November 2019 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1731 days