MERSEY WEAVER DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL

Charity Number: 1145482
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

As Scouts, we believe in preparing young people with skills for life. The Mersey Weaver Scout District supports Explorer Scout Units and the Scout Groups in Frodsham, Runcorn, Widnes and villages to encourage the young people to do more, learn more and be more. Each week, we support our members by providing the opportunity to enjoy fun and adventure while developing the skills they need to succeed

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £192,809
Total expenditure: £218,778

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Cheshire East
  • Cheshire West & Chester
  • Gwynedd
  • Halton

Governance

Registration history:
  • 17 January 2012: Standard registration
  • 19 April 2012: Funds received from 521700 WIDNES DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL
  • 16 July 2013: Funds received from 507606 NORTH WEST CHESHIRE DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL
  • 04 June 2015: Funds received from 1029515 BEACON VENTURE SCOUT UNIT
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • Mersey Weaver (Working name)
  • Mersey Weaver Scout District (Working name)
  • Mersey Weaver Scouts (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Jeff Shaw Chair 29 April 2015
None on record
Krish Daryanani Trustee 06 May 2025
None on record
Aaron Cawley Trustee 06 May 2025
4TH WIDNES (ST. BEDE'S) SCOUT GROUP
Received: On time
Grace Ellen Wheeler Trustee 03 May 2023
None on record
Andrew Steven Wheeler Trustee 20 May 2021
None on record
Oliver Chambers Trustee 26 March 2018
None on record
Michelle Lisa Pickstock Trustee 21 May 2017
None on record
Cath Mudford Trustee 30 June 2016
None on record
Ronald Sayle Trustee 05 June 2015
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £182.28k £145.09k £200.91k £225.29k £192.81k
Total expenditure £180.56k £139.69k £202.17k £258.02k £218.78k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £41.74k £40.81k £7.33k N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 31 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 31 July 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 11 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 11 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 11 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 11 August 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 29 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 29 March 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 21 May 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 21 May 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Mersey Weaver Scouts
The Heath Business & Technical Park
RUNCORN
Cheshire
WA7 4QX
Phone:
+44 1928352120