HORSLEY U3A

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
University of the Third Age is a self-help movement for people no longer in full time employment, providing educational, creative and leisure opportunities. Horsley U3A is a learning cooperative which draws upon the knowledge, experience and skills of its own members to organise and provide interest groups in accordance with the wishes of the membership. The teachers learn and the learners teach!
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
120 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Recreation
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Surrey
Governance
- 17 February 2012: Standard registration
No other names
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andy Gibson | Chair | 18 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mark Kevin Blowers | Trustee | 26 March 2025 |
|
|||||
Ray Gross | Trustee | 18 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Elaine Blowers | Trustee | 22 March 2023 |
|
|||||
Paul Dodgson | Trustee | 22 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Wendy Sampson | Trustee | 22 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
David Charles Lush | Trustee | 23 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD DEIGHTON | Trustee | 26 February 2013 |
|
|
||||
Ian David Eversden | Trustee | 17 February 2012 |
|
|||||
PETER ARTHUR TALLON | Trustee | 17 February 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.88k | £3.07k | £7.44k | £9.83k | £10.03k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.56k | £5.82k | £8.40k | £9.85k | £8.99k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 14 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 27 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 21 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 27 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 19/08/2008 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 12 JUN 2018 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 22 SEP 2021
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND, IN PARTICULAR, THE EDUCATION OF OLDER PEOPLE AND THOSE WHO ARE RETIRED FROM FULL TIME WORK, BY ALL MEANS INCLUDING ASSOCIATED ACTIVITIES CONDUCIVE TO LEARNING AND PERSONAL DEVELOPMENT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
27 Parkside Place
East Horsley
LEATHERHEAD
Surrey
KT24 5BZ
- Phone:
- 01483281221
- Email:
- secretary@horsleyu3a.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window