TRINKET BOX PRE SCHOOL LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity operates a pre school which is open to all the children from the community between the ages of 2-5 years. The pre school actively engages with the childrens' parents and carers through regular communication and feeback on their child's development and progress. Income received is reinvested in the pre school to improve the facilities and resources for the children.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income includes £266,833 from 1 government contract(s)
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Southend-on-sea
Governance
- 16 January 2012: Standard registration
- 12 December 2012: Funds received from 1138366 TRINKET BOX PRESCHOOL
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sarah Campbell | Chair | 24 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Reddihough | Trustee | 28 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Claire Bowman | Trustee | 17 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Elena Scott | Trustee | 20 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Dalley | Trustee | 20 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sophie Rivers | Trustee | 21 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Hazel Wright | Trustee | 24 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Robinson | Trustee | 08 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kevin David Lockhart | Trustee | 21 September 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £259.00k | £267.09k | £271.43k | £302.99k | £297.30k | |
|
Total expenditure | £257.89k | £282.99k | £293.48k | £301.37k | £305.13k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £210.80k | £229.57k | £228.63k | £234.94k | £266.83k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £6.70k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 24 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 24 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 23 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 23 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 06 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 06 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 10 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 10 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 15 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 15 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 08 SEP 2011 as amended on 24 Jun 2021
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN PRIMARILY UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS AND BY: (A) OFFERING APPROPRIATE PLAY, EDUCATION AND C0001ARE FACILITIES, FAMILY LEARNING AND EXTENDED HOURS GROUPS, TOGETHER WITH THE RIGHT OF PARENTS TO TAKE RESPONSIBILITY FOR AND TO BECOME INVOLVED IN THE ACTIVITIES OF SUCH GROUPS, ENSURING THAT SUCH GROUPS OFFER OPPORTUNITIES FOR ALL CHILDREN WHATEVER THEIR RACE, CULTURE, RELIGION, MEANS OR ABILITY (B) ENCOURAGING THE STUDY OF THE NEEDS OF SUCH CHILDREN AND THEIR FAMILIES AND PROMOTING PUBLIC INTEREST IN AND RECOGNITION OF SUCH NEEDS IN THE LOCAL AREAS. (C) INSTIGATING AND ADHERING TO AND FURTHERING THE AIMS AND OBJECTS OF THE PRE-SCHOOL LEARNING ALLIANCE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
TRINKET BOX PRE SCHOOL LTD
C/O THORPE GREENWAYS SCHOOLS
GREENWAYS
SOUTHEND ON SEA
ESSEX
SS1 3BS
- Phone:
- 01702582533
- Email:
- enquiries@thetrinket.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window