Financial history PISON ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 502506
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £79.64k £18.92k £19.99k £31.64k £33.99k
Total expenditure £124.86k £53.25k £40.39k £43.14k £23.93k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A