THE TOYE FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To apply funds for the benefit of charities or such charitable purposes as the trustees may determine from time to time. The Trust makes grants to a range of charities and charitable activities in accordance with the Trust's grant making policies.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Essex
Governance
- 15 May 2012: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
WILLIAM ALFRED JOHN TOYE | Chair | 14 May 2012 |
|
|
||||
Jeremy Sandy | Trustee | 04 February 2014 |
|
|||||
JOHN SPENCER WORBY | Trustee | 14 May 2012 |
|
|
||||
ROSEMARIE BERNADETTE TOYE | Trustee | 14 May 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.77k | £13.78k | £20.28k | £16.72k | £22.99k | |
|
Total expenditure | £66.98k | £56.71k | £56.30k | £49.05k | £58.29k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 20 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 09 February 2024 | 71 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 05 January 2023 | 36 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 30 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 24 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 16 DEC 2011
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES SHALL HOLD THE CAPITAL AND INCOME OF THE TRUST FUND:- (A) UPON TRUST TO APPLY THE INCOME AND ALL OR SUCH PART OR PARTS OF THE CAPITAL AT SUCH TIME OR TIMES AND IN SUCH MANNER TO OR FOR THE BENEFIT OF SUCH EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE OBJECTS AND PURPOSES IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME AND IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT; AND (B) WITH POWER TO MAKE DONATIONS TO SUCH CHARITABLE INSTITUTION OR INSTITUTIONS AT ANY TIME OR TIMES AND IN SUCH MANNER AS THEY IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION SHALL THINK FIT
Contact information
- Address:
-
Goldings Church
Englands Lane
LOUGHTON
Essex
IG10 2QX
- Phone:
- 01763247371
- Email:
- admin@thetoyefoundation.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window