PEOPLE FOR PORTLAND ROAD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our five core aims for the conservation and enhancement of Portland Road are to improve: ? its physical appearance ? community facilities ? accessibility from the local area and wider area ? safety ? community involvement This year?s activities were again focused on community involvement, celebration of heritage and improvement of the physical appearance of the area. See trustees' report.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Defined Groups
- Other Charitable Activities
- Croydon
Governance
- 30 November 2012: Standard registration
- PPR (Working name)
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christine Ann Claridge | Chair | 22 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Sedley Wilson | Trustee | 09 January 2021 |
|
|||||
Rachel McKoy | Trustee | 27 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Shuba Rao | Trustee | 27 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINA PESKETT | Trustee | 17 July 2012 |
|
|
||||
PAUL SCOTT | Trustee | 17 July 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.05k | £214 | £847 | £1.90k | £161 | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.64k | £889 | £1.08k | £3.83k | £531 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 20 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 26 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 17 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 23 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 10 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01 MAY 2011 AS AMENDED ON 27/10/2012
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC OF URBAN IN AREAS OF SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC DEPRIVATION (AND IN PARTICULAR THE AREA OF LONDON SE25) BY ALL OR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING MEANS: (A) THE MAINTENANCE, IMPROVEMENT OR PROVISION OF PUBLIC AMENITIES. (B) THE PRESERVATION OF BUILDINGS OR SITES OF HISTORIC OR ARCHITECTURAL IMPORTANCE. (C) THE PROTECTION OR CONSERVATION OF THE ENVIRONMENT. (D) THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL FACILITIES FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE OR THOSE WHO BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES, HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
74 Ferndale Road
London
SE25 4QP
- Phone:
- 07982444773
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window