BURTON-ON-TRENT UNIVERSITY OF THE THIRD AGE (U3A)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To encourage and enable older people , no longer in full time employment , to help each other , to share their knowledge skills interests skills and experience.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

14 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Recreation
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Derbyshire
- Staffordshire
Governance
- 27 February 2012: Standard registration
- BURTON-ON-TRENT U3A (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael Edward Payne | Chair | 09 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alan Edmund Poore | Trustee | 05 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jane Hance | Trustee | 05 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jane Margaret Kent | Trustee | 01 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Beverley Bhaskare | Trustee | 01 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Glynis Noreen Lewis | Trustee | 01 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Barry Peter Thomas Appleby | Trustee | 01 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Katheryn Susan Hines | Trustee | 01 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Valerie Ann Bentinck | Trustee | 01 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Hugh Rodger | Trustee | 01 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michael Clifford Bartlett | Trustee | 01 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Linda Enid Walker | Trustee | 01 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Neil Stanton Davenport | Trustee | 09 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christine Margaret Davenport | Trustee | 06 June 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/04/2020 | 01/04/2021 | 01/04/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £26.94k | £7.96k | £13.60k | £22.40k | £33.67k | |
|
Total expenditure | £25.34k | £20.68k | £12.75k | £22.39k | £28.41k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 22 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 22 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 25 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 April 2022 | 17 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 April 2021 | 13 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 April 2020 | 08 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2020 | 08 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 04 APR 2011 AS AMENDED ON 14 JUN 2016 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 12 JUL 2018 as amended on 08 Jun 2020
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND, IN PARTICULAR, THE EDUCATION OF OLDER PEOPLE AND THOSE WHO ARE RETIRED FROM FULL TIME WORK, BY ALL MEANS INCLUDING ASSOCIATED ACTIVITIES CONDUCIVE TO LEARNING AND PERSONAL DEVELOPMENT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
6 Blythfield
BURTON-ON-TRENT
Staffordshire
DE14 1TU
- Phone:
- 07512 468591
- Email:
- treasurer@botu3a.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window