Accounts and annual returns NEWCASTLE FRONTRUNNERS

Charity number: 1146403
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 19 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 16 December 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 16 December 2019 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2018 02 November 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 02 November 2018 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2017 08 June 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required