Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF THE CHURCH OF CHRIST THE SAVIOUR, EALING
Charity number: 1146203

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
REV Richard Collins Fr | Chair | 30 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Rev DAVID WANG Fr | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
NICOLE CALLENDER | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
MARK BEASTALL | Trustee | 25 November 2020 |
|
|||||
ANGELA CALLENDER | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Adams | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
STEVEN WALLIS | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
KATHERINE TRAMONI | Trustee | 01 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT MOORE | Trustee | 11 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
EBENEZER BLAVO | Trustee | 09 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
JACQUELINE ASHMENALL | Trustee | 09 January 2012 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.