WIRKSWORTH SWIMMING POOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our activities include teaching children from birth to 11 to swim plus aqua fit and aqua dance sessions to people aged from 16 to 85. Pool parties are run on a regular basis. We also run aqua volley ball sessions and other activities for children during the school holidays.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Derbyshire
Governance
- 30 March 2012: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Zoe Alexandra Kay | Trustee | 22 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dean Jones | Trustee | 12 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jill Katherine Warren | Trustee | 15 January 2018 |
|
|||||
JANNINE MCCARTHY | Trustee | 27 March 2012 |
|
|||||
MR BERNARDO VEGA-ARNANZ | Trustee | 27 March 2012 |
|
|
||||
DAVID LAWRENCE BAKER | Trustee | 27 March 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £190.34k | £152.41k | £194.31k | £179.74k | £199.28k | |
|
Total expenditure | £185.20k | £168.03k | £183.18k | £208.84k | £203.89k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 20 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 03 April 2023 | 62 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 03 April 2023 | 62 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 22 March 2022 | 50 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 22 March 2022 | 50 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 18 January 2022 | 352 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 18 January 2022 | 352 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 06 JAN 2012
Charitable objects
THE COMPANY'S OBJECT IS THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC INHABITING WIRKSWORTH AND SURROUNDING AREAS BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR SWIMMING AND OTHER WATER-BASED ACTIVITIES
Contact information
- Address:
-
Wirksworth Swimming Pool
Hannage Way
Wirksworth
MATLOCK
DE4 4JG
- Phone:
- 01629825704
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window