Financial history BUCKINGHAM TABLE

Charity number: 1146736
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £8.63k £13.78k £14.40k £14.55k £14.11k
Total expenditure £8.38k £8.31k £10.78k £18.07k £12.73k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £1.25k N/A N/A N/A