TWINKLE TOES FOUNDATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
GRANTMAKER
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 21 February 2012: Standard registration
- 09 August 2014: Removed (Does not operate)
- IZZY TWINKLE TOES (Previous name)
- IZZY TWINKLE TOES (Previous name)
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 January 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 01 January 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2013 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 10/01/2012 AS AMENDED ON 15/02/2012 AS AMENDED ON 07/01/2013
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THE ASSOCIATION WILL RELIEVE THE SICK, PROMOTE GOOD HEALTH AND THE SAVING OF LIVES IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT LIMITED TO SENDING CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE TO THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (AND SUCH OTHER PLACES IN THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT) FOR SURGERY FOR CEREBRAL PALSY WITH THE AIM THAT IT WILL IMPROVE THEIR HEALTH AND THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Area of benefit
ENGLAND AND WALES
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window