Financial history AL-HABIB ISLAMIC EDUCATIONAL AND CULTURAL CENTRE SWINDON

Charity number: 1146042
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £121.70k £128.82k £155.09k £156.32k £128.76k
Total expenditure £112.69k £77.36k £104.34k £132.04k £131.21k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £36.65k N/A N/A N/A