Accounts and annual returns AXIOM CARE LIMITED

Charity Number: 1149147
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2018 16 January 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 12 January 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 25 January 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 25 January 2017 On Time