THE FRIENDS OF ST. NICHOLAS CHURCH, STURRY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fundraising: Sponsored Knitting, Raffles, Craft Days, Concerts and Talks,
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Kent
Governance
- 16 March 2012: Standard registration
- FOSN (Working name)
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev PETER FREEMAN | Trustee | 11 March 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.24k | £2.93k | £874 | £1.53k | £837 | |
|
Total expenditure | £917 | £19.50k | £55 | £121 | £172 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 118 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 118 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 17 July 2024 | 168 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 17 July 2024 | 533 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 15 February 2022 | 15 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 March 2021 | 58 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 14 NOV 2011
Charitable objects
THE FRIENDS IS ESTABLISHED TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION BY CONTRIBUTING TO THE PRESERVATION, REPAIR, MAINTENANCE AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PARISH CHURCH OF ST.NICHOLAS STURRY WITHIN THE PARISH OF STURRY IN THE DIOCESE OF CANTERBURY, AT THE DISCRETION OF THE FRIENDS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 Well Close
Sturry
Canterbury
CT2 0JN
- Phone:
- 01227710447
- Email:
- fosn.sturrychurch@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window