FRIENDS OF SEAGRY SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Friends of Seagry School raise money for additional and new equipment for Seagry Primary School through various activities throughout the year. We also raise money to fund school trips to enhance the education of the pupils at the school. Activities vary year on year, although regular annual events include a local Small Schools Sports Tournament, Conker Championships and Christmas Bazaar.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Other Charitable Activities
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 29 May 2012: Standard registration
- FOSS (Working name)
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nigel Watson | Trustee | 22 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Antonia Wykeham | Trustee | 22 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Helen Margaret Lilley | Trustee | 30 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Emma Jane Sorrell | Trustee | 07 November 2017 |
|
|||||
Lee Green | Trustee | 22 April 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.72k | £4.26k | £17.92k | £9.51k | £12.62k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.27k | £1.27k | £20.83k | £7.78k | £7.77k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 15 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 10 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 24 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 23 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 26 March 2021 | 87 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 27/03/2012
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BY: DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE STAFF PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL; ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Seagry Primary School
Upper Seagry
Chippenham
SN15 5EX
- Phone:
- 01249 720213
- Email:
- admin@seagry.wilts.sch.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window