HULL SAVOYARDS AMATEUR OPERATIC AND DRAMATIC SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objects of the Society are to educate the public in the dramatic and operatic arts, promote principally the works of Gilbert and Sullivan and to further the development of public appreciation and taste in the said arts. To assist and further such charitable institutions and charitable purposes as the committee shall from time to time determine; and in furtherance of this, but not otherwise.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
32 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Charitable Activities
- East Riding Of Yorkshire
Governance
- 19 March 2012: Standard registration
- HULL SAVOYARDS (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
HAROLD KAY JP | Chair | 04 February 2012 |
|
|||||
MARLENE PINCHBECK | Trustee | 04 February 2012 |
|
|
||||
LAURINE FLORENCE KAY | Trustee | 04 February 2012 |
|
|
||||
MIKE AUSTIN | Trustee | 04 February 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.87k | £680 | £9.74k | £7.07k | £10.41k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.11k | £223 | £7.74k | £7.02k | £9.72k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 07 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 25 June 2024 | 25 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 28 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 09 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 10 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01 SEP 2011
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE SOCIETY ARE TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE DRAMATIC AND OPERATIC ARTS, PROMOTE PRINCIPALLY THE WORKS OF GILBERT AND SULLIVAN AND TO FURTHER THE DEVELOPMENT OF PUBLIC APPRECIATION AND TASTE IN THE SAID ARTS. TO ASSIST AND FURTHER SUCH CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS AND CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE COMMITTEE SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE; AND IN FURTHERANCE OF THIS, BUT NOT OTHERWISE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
43 George Street
Cottingham
HU16 5QP
- Phone:
- 01482847046
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window