KNOWLEDGE FOR CHANGE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We aim to improve the standard of healthcare provision in Sub-Saharan Africa (SSA) and the UK through the training of staff and students in both regions. We run undergraduate student exchange programmes between SSA and UK, and also place professional UK volunteers within healthcare facilities in SSA on long and short-term basis in order to provide training and facilitate knowledge exchange.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
175 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- India
- Tanzania
- Uganda
Governance
- 17 April 2012: Standard registration
- 12 November 2018: Funds received from 1135219 THE LIVERPOOL MULAGO PARTNERSHIP FOR WOMEN'S AND C...
- K4C (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Professor Louise Ackers | Chair | 13 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
Allan Ndawula | Trustee | 06 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Melanie Stephens | Trustee | 06 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Claire Horder | Trustee | 25 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Robert Ssekitoleko | Trustee | 11 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
Dr John Chatwin | Trustee | 11 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
Dr James Ackers-Johnson | Trustee | 13 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
Dr Chris Coey | Trustee | 13 January 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £197.50k | £123.69k | £81.70k | £254.26k | £433.83k | |
|
Total expenditure | £142.90k | £163.69k | £79.21k | £294.65k | £409.93k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £15.14k | £12.63k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 09 December 2024 | 39 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 09 December 2024 | 39 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 10 January 2024 | 71 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 10 January 2024 | 71 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 07 November 2022 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 07 November 2022 | 7 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 20 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 20 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 16 November 2020 | 16 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 16 November 2020 | 16 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 10 JAN 2012
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PRESERVATION OF THE HEALTH OF PATIENTS OF SUB-SAHARAN AFRICA AND THE UNITED KINGDOM IN PARTICULAR THROUGH CHARITABLE ACTIVITIES IN HEALTHCARE CENTRES THROUGHOUT SUB-SAHARAN AFRICA, ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES, SUPPORT SERVICES, EQUIPMENT NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE STATUTORY AUTHORITIES AND ANY OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES / ACTIVITIES.TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE HEALTH WORKERS OF SUB-SAHARAN AFRICA AND THE UNITED KINGDOM BY PROMOTING EDUCATION, KNOWLEDGE EXCHANGE AND PERSONAL EXPERIENCE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Knowledge for Change
11 Newmarket Street
SKIPTON
North Yorkshire
BD23 2HX
- Phone:
- 01612950383
- Email:
- info@Knowledge4Change.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window