Improving Lives Notts Ltd

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT LIMITED TO PROVIDING ONE TO ONE SUPPORT SERVICES TO ADULTS WITH COMPLEX HEALTH AND SOCIAL NEEDS IN NOTTINGHAM CITY AND NOTTINGHAMSHIRE AND NATIONWIDE ADVICE
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Nottingham City
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 27 February 2012: Standard registration
- IMPROVING LIVES NOTTS (Working name)
- INTEGRITAS ADVOCACY LIMITED (Previous name)
- INTEGRITAS ADVOCACY LTD (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Holly Alana Sexton | Trustee | 27 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Georgina Charles | Trustee | 02 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kayleigh Brown | Trustee | 22 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Ashburner | Trustee | 14 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Ola Junaid | Trustee | 12 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Hawkins | Trustee | 24 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
DR MICHAEL HARRIS | Trustee | 30 January 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £317.27k | £397.31k | £407.69k | £376.41k | £449.29k | |
|
Total expenditure | £274.86k | £302.41k | £377.50k | £398.32k | £407.89k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £3.33k | N/A | £4.80k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 23 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | 23 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 16 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | 16 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 04 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | 04 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 17 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | 17 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 07 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | 07 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 23 FEB 2012 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 01 APR 2016 as amended on 28 Nov 2018 as amended on 27 Jan 2020
Charitable objects
The relief of those in need in particular but not limited to providing one to one support services to adults with complex health and social needs in Nottingham City and Nottinghamshire and nationwide advice.
Area of benefit
NOTTINGHAM CITY NOTTINGHAMSHIRE LEICESTERSHIRE LEICESTER CITY
Contact information
- Address:
-
INTERNATIONAL COMMUNITY CENTRE
61B MANSFIELD ROAD
NOTTINGHAM
NG1 3FN
- Phone:
- 01159348411
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window