WALLASEY INDEPENDENT RECYCLING ENTERPRISE (WIRE) LIMITED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Firstly the Charity stops used goods going to Landfill which is costly to the taxpayer and harmful to the planet. They work with Local charities and Government departments to allow people on placements to gain both work experience and qualifications. The Charity works with the local authority, social services and various other Charities to provide recycled furniture cheaper than anywhere else.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2019
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Liverpool City
- Wirral
Governance
- 18 April 2012: Standard registration
- 07 February 2024: Removed (Does not operate)
- WIRE LTD (Working name)
- WALLASEY INDEPENDENT RECYCLING ENTERPRISE (Previous name)
- WALLASEY INDEPENDENT RECYCLING ENTERPRISE (WIRE) LTD (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2015 | 31/10/2016 | 31/10/2017 | 31/10/2018 | 31/10/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £55.89k | £53.64k | £40.62k | £46.49k | £42.77k | |
|
Total expenditure | £58.13k | £55.67k | £39.29k | £46.37k | £42.79k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 04 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | 04 August 2020 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 02 NOV 2010 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 21/03/2012
Charitable objects
(A) THE PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROMOTION OF SUSTAINABLE WASTE MANAGEMENT PRACTICES, (B) THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP BY THE PROVISION OF RECYCLED AND REUSED ITEMS TO PEOPLE IN NEED. (C) THE RELIEF OF UNEMPLOYMENT BY THE PROVISION OF TRAINING AND WORK EXPERIENCE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window