WEST MIDLANDS AMBULANCE FASTAID EMERGENCY COMMUNITY RESPONDER SCHEME(BLACK COUNTRY)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO RELIEVE SICKNESS & PRESERVE THE GOOD HEALTH OF PERSONS IN BLACK COUNTRY & THE SURROUNDING AREA'S, BY THE PREVISION OF TRAINED & EQUIPPED VOLUNTEERS, IN PARTICULAR NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY RESPONDING TO CATEGORY A 999 CALLS Fastaid Black Country core activities are catorised as Respond to 999 calls Training & supporting other responder groups Increasing awareness of heart problems and prevention
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Sandwell
- Walsall
Governance
- 15 June 2012: Standard registration
- FASTAID WALSALL (Working name)
- Walsall CFR (Working name)
- Walsall Community First Responders (Working name)
- FASTAID (BLACK COUNTRY) (Previous name)
- Care Quality Commission
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rhea Green | Trustee | 22 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Karen Kay | Trustee | 22 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Balbir Kaur | Trustee | 22 November 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.82k | £820 | £0 | £7.24k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.36k | £2.94k | £7.24k | £0 | £1.86k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 16 May 2024 | 106 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 11 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 18 March 2022 | 46 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 07 April 2021 | 66 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 13 FEB 2012 AS AMENDED ON 13/06/2012 as amended on 15 May 2024 as amended on 12 Jun 2024
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTIVE OF THE ASSOCIATION SHALL BE TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND PRESERVE THE GOOD HEALTH OF PERSONS IN BLACK COUNTRY AND THE SURROUNDING AREA'S, BY THE PREVISION OF TRAINED AND EQUIPPED VOLUNTEERS, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY RESPONDING TO CATEGORY A MEDICAL EMERGENCIES, AS DIRECTED BY WEST MIDLANDS AMBULANCE SERVICE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
C/O Willenhall Ambulance Hub
Electrium Point
Ashmore Lake Way
Willenhall
WV12 4LF
- Phone:
- 03001240276
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window