THE DAN ELEY FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
. Website completed. Memorandum of Understanding completed with partner charity FUDUT in Cali,Colombia . First funds sent to partner charity to commence 6 month training course for 30 underprivileged youths in IT and accountancy skills. Students graduated from theory to practical stage of course. Mid term report compiled and presented to donors.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Surrey
- Colombia
Governance
- 21 March 2012: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr SARA LYNNE ARBER MSC PHD | Trustee | 25 August 2016 |
|
|||||
Dr CHRISTOPHER JAGGER MBE | Trustee | 17 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
SHARON ELIZABETH WARD FCA | Trustee | 17 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD DUNNING | Trustee | 17 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW HUMPHREYS BSC | Trustee | 17 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
CAROLYN MARJORIE HELEN ELEY BSC HONS | Trustee | 17 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
Daniel John Eley BSC | Trustee | 17 January 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £144.43k | £71.96k | £11.04k | £46.36k | £10.09k | |
|
Total expenditure | £122.08k | £55.85k | £50.04k | £37.17k | £24.27k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 07 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 05 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 05 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 22 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 08 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 08 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 01 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 01 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 19/03/2012
Charitable objects
TO ACT AS A RESOURCE FOR YOUNG PEOPLE IN COLOMBIA AND OTHER LATIN AMERICAN COUNTRIES BY PROVIDING ADVICE AND ASSISTANCE AND ORGANISING PROGRAMMES OF PHYSICAL, EDUCATIONAL AND OTHER ACTIVITIES AS A MEANS OF: (A)ADVANCING IN LIFE AND HELPING YOUNG PEOPLE BY DEVELOPING THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS INDEPENDENT, MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS; (B)ADVANCING EDUCATION AND TRAINING; AND (C)RELIEVING UNEMPLOYMENT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Field View
Petworth Road
Witley
Godalming
GU8 5QW
- Phone:
- 01428687779
- Email:
- dan@daneleyfoundation.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window