Financial history THE UNIVERSITY OF GLOUCESTERSHIRE STUDENTS' UNION

Charity number: 1148393
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £859.64k £714.73k £838.96k £820.54k £863.68k
Total expenditure £814.19k £650.23k £771.87k £854.35k £849.58k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £442.00k £515.70k £528.00k £548.69k £588.70k
Income - Other trading activities £109.84k £63.83k £85.94k £82.59k £86.35k
Income - Charitable activities £307.39k £135.15k £224.85k £185.25k £181.38k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £407 £52 £166 £4.01k £7.25k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £755.81k £609.93k £727.64k £820.50k £827.51k
Expenditure - Raising funds £58.38k £40.30k £44.23k £33.85k £22.07k
Expenditure - Governance £125.54k £130.29k £93.62k £113.81k £131.92k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0