SANGEETHA OF THE UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
(A) Promoting the benefit of the inhabitants of Croydon and the neighbouring boroughs by providing facilities in the interest of social welfare for recreation and leisure-time occupation with the object of improving the conditions of life for the said inhabitants
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Croydon
- Kent
- Newham
- Surrey
Governance
- 17 January 2013: Standard registration
- SANGEETHA LIMITED (Previous name)
- SANGEETHA OF THE UK (Previous name)
- SANGEETHA OF THE UK (Previous name)
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PRAKASH RAMASWAMY | Chair | 07 February 2012 |
|
|
||||
VIVEK BALAKRISHNAN | Trustee | 30 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
BHASKARAN SUNDARESAN | Trustee | 07 February 2012 |
|
|
||||
JAYAPRAKASH PANICKER | Trustee | 07 February 2012 |
|
|
||||
CHELLAMMA KESAVAN SUJATHAN | Trustee | 07 February 2012 |
|
|
||||
SIVASANKARA PILLAI VIJAYAKUMAR | Trustee | 07 February 2012 |
|
|
||||
ABHILASH SUDHAKARAN | Trustee | 07 February 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £33.05k | £3.49k | £1.49k | £9.39k | £8.20k | |
|
Total expenditure | £31.92k | £7.03k | £2.68k | £8.28k | £7.93k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 27 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 22 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 14 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 06 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 24 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 24 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 12/04/2010 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 15/08/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 06/01/2013
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE COMPANY ARE: (A)TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF CROYDON AND THE NEIGHBOURING BOROUGHS (HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE AREA OF BENEFIT") WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, NATIONALITY, AGE, DISABILITY, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS AND THE STATUTORY AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS; (B)TO RELIEVE POVERTY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PROMOTING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF POVERTY RELIEF MEASURES BY OTHER INDIVIDUALS, CHARITIES, NON GOVERNMENTAL ORGANISATIONS OR OTHER VOLUNTARY, NOT FOR PROFIT OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS THAT SUPPORT THE RELIEF OF POVERTY; AND (C)TO PROMOTE SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE DETERMINED. THE COMPANY SHALL BE NON-PARTY IN POLITICS AND NON-SECTARIAN IN RELIGION.
Area of benefit
CROYDON AND THE NEIGHBOURING BOROUGHS
Contact information
- Address:
-
5 Rayleigh Rise
South Croydon
CR2 7AN
- Phone:
- 07917361127
- Email:
- info@sangeetha.net
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window