FARMING AND WILDLIFE ADVISORY GROUP SOUTH WEST LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
FWAG SW is a conservation charity that focuses on the interaction between wildlife and the farmed environment. To do this it seeks to support, enthuse & inspire farmers to value the environmental assets on their land & use them to secure sustainable and profitable businesses for the future. By using a Whole Farm approach FWAG SW seek to embed conservation into the commercial farming model.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£3,363,565
Donations and legacies | £163.11k | |
Charitable activities | £3.19m | |
Other trading activities | £4.21k | |
Investments | £730 | |
Other | £1.63k |
Total expenditure:
£3,744,152
Raising funds | £44.46k | |
Charitable activities | £3.70m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £1,088,649 from 33 government contract(s) and £1,179,375 from 37 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £44.46k | |
Charitable expenditure | £3.70m |
People

67 Employee(s)
9 Trustee(s)
55 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England
Governance
- 23 February 2012: Standard registration
- 20 December 2022: Funds received from 299418 UPPER THAMES PROTECTION SOCIETY
- FWAG SOUTH WEST (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Silas Charles Walker | Chair | 19 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Simon Alan Gibson | Trustee | 21 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
Benjamin Charles Hole | Trustee | 21 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
Melanie Ruth Bradley | Trustee | 21 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
Heather Webb | Trustee | 08 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mark Richard Humphry | Trustee | 07 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Wilson | Trustee | 07 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Fowle | Trustee | 18 October 2017 |
|
|||||
ALOYSIA DAROS | Trustee | 09 November 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.93m | £2.92m | £3.86m | £3.55m | £3.36m | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.94m | £2.58m | £3.65m | £3.84m | £3.74m | |
|
Income from government contracts | £412.53k | £771.70k | £831.92k | £718.11k | £1.09m | |
|
Income from government grants | £878.17k | £1.23m | £2.00m | £1.60m | £1.18m | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £110.71k | £142.65k | £127.86k | £168.45k | £163.11k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £23.62k | £11.02k | £7.49k | £11.97k | £4.21k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £1.79m | £2.76m | £3.72m | £3.37m | £3.19m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £287 | £41 | £19 | £442 | £730 | |
|
Income - Other | £2.23k | £580 | £0 | £2.04k | £1.63k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £1.90m | £2.58m | £3.63m | £3.80m | £3.70m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £39.80k | £4.22k | £15.98k | £40.19k | £44.46k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £5.64k | £5.97k | £9.66k | £9.86k | £10.75k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £3.75k | £0 | £4.40k | £34.51k | £49.11k | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £10.29k | £11.47k | £17.27k | £18.73k | £38.29k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £834.39k | £1.43m | £1.92m | £1.30m | £953.44k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £512.94k | £780.01k | £1.07m | £729.64k | £787.71k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 03 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 03 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 20 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 20 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 09 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 14 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 08 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 18 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 23 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 23 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 29 NOV 2011 as amended on 07 Sep 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS FOR WHICH THE COMPANY IS ESTABLISHED ARE TO PROMOTE THE PROTECTION OF WILDLIFE AND THE CONSERVATION OF NATURE AND LANDSCAPE IN PARTICULAR WITH RELATION TO MODERN AGRICULTURAL NEEDS. TO PROMOTE THE DELIVERY OF COMPETENT, INDEPENDENT ADVICE TO THE AGRICULTURAL SECTOR ON THE PROTECTION OF WILDLIFE AND THE CONSERVATION OF NATURE AND LANDSCAPE. TO PROMOTE RESEARCH ON ALL MATTERS RELATING TO MODERN FARMING AND THE NEED TO CONSERVE NATURE AND LANDSCAPE AND TO PROTECT WILDLIFE ON FARMLAND AND TO DISSEMINATE THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH REASEARCH. TO ENCOURAGE UNDERSTANDING BETWEEN FARMERS AND CONSERVATION INTERESTS BY PROMOTING, LIAISON AND THE EXCHANGE OF INFORMATION, IDEAS AND EXPERIENCE BETWEEN INDIVIDUALS AND ORGANISATIONS AND ORGANISATIONS WHO ARE CONCERNED WITH OR INTERESTED IN THE OBJECTS OF THE COMPANY. TO PROMOTE THE OBJECTS OF THE COMPANY BY CONFERENCES, EXHIBITIONS, PRACTICAL DEMONSTRATIONS, PUBLICATIONS, THE DELIVERY OF LECTURES AND ADDRESSES AND THE EXCHANGE OF RESEARCH EXPERIENCES AND TECHNIQUES. TO SUPPORT AND CO-OPERATE WITH OTHERS IN PROPOSAL AND ACTIVITIES WHICH ENCOURAGE UNDERSTANDING AND CO-OPERATION BETWEN CONSERVATION, WILDLIFE AND FARMING INTERESTS AND WHICH ARE CALCULATED TO ASSIST THE PROMOTION OF THE COMPANY'S OBJECTS. TO ESTABLISH AND SUPPORT OR AID IN THE ESTABLISHMENT AND SUPPORT OF ANY CHARITABLE ASSOCIATIONS AND INSTITUTIONS AND TO SUBSCRIBE OR GUARENTEE MONEY FOR CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN THE WAY CONNECTED WITH THE COMPANY'S PURPOSES OR CALCULATED TO FURTHER ITS OBJECTS. TO UNDERTAKE AND EXECUTE ANY TRUSTS WHICH MAY LAWFULLY BE UNDERTAKEN BY THE COMPANY AND WHICH MAY BE NECESSARY FOR ITS OBJECTS. SUBJECT TO THE JURISDICTION OF THE CHARITY COMMISSIONERS FOR ENGLAND AND WALES TO PURCHASE OR BY ANY OTHER MEANS ACQUIRE ANY FREEHOLD, LEASEHOLD OR OTHER PROPERTY OR ESTATE OR INTEREST WHATEVER, AND ANY RIGHTS, PRIVILEGES OR EASEMENTS OVER OR IN RESPECT OF ANY PROPERTY AS MAY BE CONDUCIVE TO ITS OBJECTS. TO SELL, MORTGAGE, DISPOSE OR TURN TO ACCOUNT ALL OR ANY OF THE PROPERTY OR ASSETS OF THE COMPANY AS MAY BE THOUGH EXPEDIENT WITH A VIEW TO THE PROMOTION OF ITS OBJECTS. TO BORROW, RAISE, OR RECEIVE MONEY IN SUCH MANNER AS THE COMPANY MAY THINK FIT FOR SUCH PURPOSES WHICH PROMOTES ITS OBJECTS. TO INVEST MONEYS OF THE COMPANY NOT IMMEDIATELY REQUIRED FOR ITS PURPOSES IN OR UPON SUCH INVESTMENTS, SECURITIES OR PROPERTIES AS MAY BE THOUGHT FIT, BUT SO THAT MONEYS SUBJECT TO, OR REPRESENTING PROPERTY SUBJECT TO, THE JURISDICTION OF THE CHARITY COMMISSIONERS FOR ENGLAND AND WALES SHALL ONLY BE INVESTED IN SUCH SECURITIES AND WITH SUCH SANCTION, IF ANY, AS MAY FOR THE TIME BEING BE PRESCRIBED BY LAW. TO EMPLOY OR CONTRACT FOR THE SERVICES OF OR FACILITATE OTHER IN THE EMPLOYMENT OR CONTRACTING FOR THE SERVICES OF A PERSON OR PERSON TO FACILITATE THE CARRYING OUT OF THE OBJECTS OF THE COMPANY. IF AND WHEN CONSIDERED ADVISABLE TO TAKE ALL SUCH MEASURES AS MAY BE NECESSARY TO CONVERT THE COMPANY INTO A BODY SPECIALLY INCORPORATED BY ROYAL CHARTER OR OTHERWISE, OR TO SECURE THE CREATION OF A NEW BODY SO INCORPORATED WITH THE OBJECT OF CARRYING OUT THE PURPOSES OF THE COMPANY AND CONTINUING THE WORK THEREOF. TO TAKE ALL SUCH OTHER STEPS AS WILL FURTHER THE ATTAINMENT OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS OR ANY OF THEM.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Hawkridge House
Summerfield Way
Chelston Business Park
Wellington
Somerset
TA21 9JE
- Phone:
- 01823660684
- Email:
- info@fwagsw.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window