Accounts and annual returns THE WATERFALL TRUST

Charity number: 1148491
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 28 February 2021 16 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2021 16 November 2021 On Time
Annual return 29 February 2020 16 November 2021 322 days late
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 16 November 2021 322 days late
Annual return 28 February 2019 19 November 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2019 19 November 2019 On Time
Annual return 28 February 2018 14 December 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2018 14 December 2018 On Time