THE WATERFALL TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A PROGRAMME TO HELP WOMEN CHANGE DESTRUCTIVE BEHAVIOUR INCLUDING SUBSTANCE ABUSE AND UNHEALTHY RELATIONSHIPS. GROUP WORK 3 HRS WEEKLY, 1-TO-1S, LIFE SKILLS AND EQUINE ASSISTED LEARNING REFERRAL: SELF AND LOCAL DRUG/ALCOHOL SERVICES FUNDRAISING ACTIVITY AIMED AT OPENING 5 DAY A WEEK RECOVERY PROGRAMME AWARENESS RAISING EVENTS AIMED AT EQUIPPING THE WIDER CHURCH TO GIVE EFFECTIVE RECOVERY SUPPORT
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 28 February 2021
Total income includes £14,606 from 1 government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Southampton City
Governance
- 09 August 2012: Standard registration
- 27 January 2022: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- 27 January 2022: Funds transferred to 1194419 ACORN CHAPLAINCY
- THE WATERFALL (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 28/02/2017 | 28/02/2018 | 28/02/2019 | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £73.11k | £50.63k | £51.09k | £32.99k | £27.14k | |
|
Total expenditure | £55.21k | £69.65k | £47.97k | £36.54k | £32.72k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | £14.61k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 16 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | 16 November 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 16 November 2021 | 322 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | 16 November 2021 | 322 days late | |
Annual return | 28 February 2019 | 19 November 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2019 | 19 November 2019 | On Time | |
Annual return | 28 February 2018 | 14 December 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2018 | 14 December 2018 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 08 DEC 2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 19/07/2012
Charitable objects
THE CHARITIES OBJECTS (‘OBJECTS’) ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING: IT IS THE CHARITY’S INTENTION THAT THE SUPPORT, CARE, AND OTHER SERVICES TO BE PROVIDED AND MADE AVAILABLE PURSUANT TO THE OBJECTS SHALL BE EXTENDED TO AND FOR THE BENEFIT OF, PERSONS IN NEED OF SUCH SUPPORT AND CARE/OR ASSISTANCE, LIVING IN THE COUNTY OF HAMPSHIRE AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE DIRECTORS OF THE CHARITY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT. TO PROMOTE THE REHABILITATION AND RESETTLEMENT OF WOMEN WHOSE LIVES HAVE BECOME UNMANAGEABLE AND / OR ARE AT RISK, AS A RESULT OF THE USE OF DRUGS, ALCOHOL AND / OR SEXUAL EXPLOITATION BY PROVIDING RESIDENTIAL ACCOMMODATION AND SUPPORT PROGRAMMES.
Area of benefit
THE COUNTY OF HAMPSHIRE AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window