DONCASTER PRIDE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO PROMOTE EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AND IN PARTICULAR THE ELIMINATION OF DISCRIMINATION ON THE GROUNDS OF SEXUAL ORIENTATION AND GENDER IDENTITY OF THOSE LIVING IN DONCASTER AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS BY:
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
44 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Doncaster
Governance
- 10 April 2012: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JENNIFER DEWSNAP | Chair | 18 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
John Anthony O'Neill | Trustee | 07 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
TREVOR JONES | Trustee | 18 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Dorlin-Wagstaff | Trustee | 29 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
CATHERINE FOX | Trustee | 18 February 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £45.82k | £11.69k | £15.85k | £52.73k | £84.52k | |
|
Total expenditure | £44.91k | £1.71k | £11.95k | £59.13k | £68.07k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £5.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 16 February 2024 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 16 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01/09/2008 AS AMENDED ON 02/04/2012 as amended on 07 Nov 2016
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AND IN PARTICULAR THE ELIMINATION OF DISCRIMINATION ON THE GROUNDS OF SEXUAL ORIENTATION AND GENDER IDENTITY OF THOSE LIVING IN DONCASTER AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS BY: 1) RAISING AWARENESS AMONG THE PUBLIC ABOUT THE ISSUES AND DIFFICULTIES AFFECTING THE LIVES OF LESBIAN, GAY, BISEXUAL AND TRANSGENDER (LGBT) PEOPLE; 2) CULTIVATING A SENTIMENT IN FAVOUR OF EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY IN PARTICULAR THROUGH CELEBRATING THE DIVERSITY OF THE LGBT COMMUNITY; AND 3) STAGING AN ANNUAL LGBT FESTIVAL AND SMALLER EVENTS THROUGHOUT THE AREA.
Contact information
- Address:
-
West Suite
Unit F
Lakeside Boulevard
Doncaster
DN4 5PL
- Phone:
- 07813197107
- Email:
- info@doncasterpride.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window