Financial history BRITISH FRIENDS OF MATAN

Charity Number: 1145843
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £20.47k £3.68k £4.81k £10.19k £6.29k
Total expenditure £21.02k £0 £0 £10.02k £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A