KHALSA DIWAN AFGHANISTAN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objects of the charity are: 1. The advancement of the Sikh religion. 2. The advancement of education for the public benefit. 3. The relief of need, in particular but not exclusively in Afghanistan, India and Pakistan by the provision of funds, goods and services designed to relieve those needs.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Birmingham City
- Stoke-on-trent City
- Afghanistan
- Austria
- Belgium
- Canada
- France
- Germany
- India
- Italy
- Netherlands
- Pakistan
- Switzerland
- United Arab Emirates
- United States
Governance
- 01 June 2012: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BHAJAN SINGH | Chair | 14 February 2012 |
|
|
||||
JAGPAL SINGH | Trustee | 14 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
PARPENDAR SINGH CHUK | Trustee | 14 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
HARINDER SINGH | Trustee | 14 February 2012 |
|
|
||||
JOGINDER SINGH | Trustee | 14 February 2012 |
|
|
||||
SAROP SINGH ARORA | Trustee | 14 February 2012 |
|
|
||||
PREETPAL SINGH KHANEJA | Trustee | 14 February 2012 |
|
|
||||
RAJ SINGH KHATRI | Trustee | 14 February 2012 |
|
|
||||
DALEL SINGH GABHA | Trustee | 14 February 2012 |
|
|
||||
HARKISHAN SINGH | Trustee | 14 February 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.93k | £9.12k | £3.11k | £612 | £18.29k | |
|
Total expenditure | £136 | £712 | £233 | £296 | £12.63k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 16 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 16 May 2024 | 106 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 19 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 05 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 21/05/2012
Charitable objects
1. THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE SIKH RELIGION. 2. THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT. 3. THE RELIEF OF NEED, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN AFGHANISTAN, INDIA AND PAKISTAN, BY THE PROVISION OF FUNDS, GOODS AND SERVICES DESIGNED TO RELIEVE THOSE NEEDS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
UNIT 7
HOUNSLOW BUSINESS PARK
ALICE WAY
HOUNSLOW
MIDDLESEX
TW3 3UD
- Phone:
- 02085778773
- Email:
- charity@KHALSADIWAN.CO.UK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window