HOLMES CHAPEL AND DISTRICT COMMUNITY PARTNERSHIP
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
? Value, celebrate and develop talents of children, young people and colleagues ? Challenge and address underachievement ? Identify and remove barriers to learning ? Promote lifelong learning through widening participation involving our community
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Cheshire East
Governance
- 31 July 2012: Standard registration
- 29 July 2024: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2018 | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £45.59k | £169.21k | £39.69k | £54.21k | £30.93k | |
|
Total expenditure | £45.13k | £128.58k | £37.19k | £41.05k | £54.76k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 13 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 13 June 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 27 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 27 June 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 11 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 11 April 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 19 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 19 June 2020 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01 DEC 2011 AS AMENDED ON 28/06/2012
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY’S OBJECTS ARE: 1. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS AT MEMBER SCHOOLS BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION AT THE SCHOOL; 2. TO ADVANCE IN LIFE AND RELIEVE NEEDS OF YOUNG PEOPLE THROUGH: (A) THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES PROVIDED IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE, DESIGNED TO IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; (B) PROVIDING SUPPORT AND ACTIVITIES WHICH DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS. 3. THE PROMOTION OF GOOD HEALTH OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE AND THEIR FAMILIES, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF FAMILY SUPPORT PROJECT TO GIVE ADVICE AND COUNSELING.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window