COVENTRY OLD GRAMMAR SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We have secured the medium term future of the Old Grammar School through a significant fund raising joint venture with Coventry Transport Museum. This partnership has also provided a 30 year location for the Old Grammar School activities and the Trustees are now actively planning the use of these excellent facilities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Coventry City
Governance
- 15 November 2012: Standard registration
- C.O.G.S. (Working name)
- COVENTRY OLD GRAMMAR SCHOOL LTD. (Previous name)
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
George Osuala | Trustee | 10 September 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
Professor Simon Brake | Trustee | 20 July 2016 |
|
|||||||||
ANDREW PETER CARPENTER | Trustee | 26 April 2012 |
|
|
||||||||
BILL JOHNSON | Trustee | 26 April 2012 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | 31/10/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1 | £1 | £1 | £20 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2024 | 08 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2024 | 08 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 08 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 08 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 14 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 22 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 13 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 13 August 2021 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION CONVERSION DATED 24 JAN 2022
Charitable objects
(I) ADVANCEMENT OF THE RELIGIOUS EDUCATION OF PERSONS UNDER 25 YEARS OF AGE WHO ARE RESIDENT OR OTHERWISE ASSOCIATED WITH THE PARISH OF HOLY TRINITY, COVENTRY IN ACCORDANCE WITH PRINCIPLES OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND; (II) THE PROMOTION OF THE RELIGIOUS OR OTHER CHARITABLE WORK OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND IN SAID PARISH
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 INNIS ROAD
COVENTRY
CV5 6AX
- Phone:
- 02476711849
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window