THE PEWSEY AND DISTRICT FEAST AND CARNIVAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our aim is to promote the culture and heritage of our community whilst advancing any charitable purpose for the benefit of the community. We organise a series of community events in the second and third weeks of September each year around the Pewsey area targeted to provide something for all ages. Events include competitions, dances, races, talks and a Carnival first run in 1897.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
Total income includes £4,459 from 3 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
60 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 09 February 2012: Standard registration
- 03 July 2019: Funds received from 1100015 THE PEWSEY AND DISTRICT FEASTE AND CARNIVAL
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Hannah Louise Parsons | Trustee | 17 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Andrea Saunders | Trustee | 21 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Julia Ann Marshall | Trustee | 09 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Alison Creasey-Benjamin | Trustee | 25 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Michael High | Trustee | 20 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
James Walker | Trustee | 13 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Carol Parsons | Trustee | 05 December 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £96.87k | £42.85k | £58.73k | £89.71k | £113.18k | |
|
Total expenditure | £85.15k | £45.12k | £40.33k | £106.22k | £103.33k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.74k | £11.71k | £13.29k | £4.30k | £4.46k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 26 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | 26 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 28 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | 28 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 22 February 2022 | 84 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | 22 February 2022 | 84 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 02 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | 02 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 06 SEP 2007
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY OF PEWSEY AND SURROUNDING AREA AND TO PRESERVE THE CULTURAL HERITAGE AND TRADITION OF THE PEWSEY AND DISTRICT FEASTE BY THE PROMOTION OF AN ANNUAL CARNIVAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE OLD FIRE ENGINE HOUSE
NORTH STREET
PEWSEY
WILTSHIRE
SN9 5EX
- Phone:
- 01672563101
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window