STEWARD MINISTRIES
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
HOLDING REGULAR WORSHIP SERVICES IN THE COMMUNITY TO PROMOTE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2013
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Lambeth
Governance
- 27 February 2012: Standard registration
- 05 November 2014: Removed (Does not operate)
- HOTWM (Working name)
- HOUSE OF THE WORD MINISTRY (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2012 | 31/10/2013 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £400 | £400 | |
|
Total expenditure | £400 | £400 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2013 | 09 December 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2013 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2012 | 27 November 2013 | 88 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2012 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 10 JAN 2012 AS AMENDED ON 22/11/2013
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE ORGANISATION'S ARE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC: TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH [IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS] IN SUCH WAYS AND IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT;
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window