ALEX HULME FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To relieve sickness, to promote and protect good health by supporting research, for the public benefit, into the treatment of children with Non Hodgkin Lymphoma. Have supported Dr S Turner of Addenbrooks, Cambridge, in setting up a research project with the aim of producing better, less toxic and invasive treatments for children with Non Hodgkin Lymphoma and, eventually to find a cure.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England
Governance
- 21 February 2012: Standard registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Hulme | Chair | 16 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
NICOLA JANE HULME | Trustee | 16 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
Brenda Jackson | Trustee | 16 January 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | 31/10/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £23.57k | £24.74k | £20.85k | £18.00k | £14.03k | |
|
Total expenditure | £49.37k | £0 | £20.01k | £0 | £30.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2024 | 08 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 26 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 01 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 02 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 11 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 01/02/2012
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT GOOD HEALTH BY SUPPORTING RESEARCH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT INTO THE TREATMENT OF CHILDREN WITH NON-HODGKINS LYMPHOMA.
Contact information
- Address:
-
8 Edinburgh Close
SALE
Cheshire
M33 4EZ
- Phone:
- 01983856544
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window