FRIENDS OF HEIGHINGTON MILLFIELD PRIMARY ACADEMY

Charity number: 1146524
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

raise funds through social events for both children and adults as a social setting whilst raising funds for the school for additional resources to enrich the childrens environment and curriculum learning and needs.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 11 September 2024

Total income: £20,072
Total expenditure: £19,162

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Lincolnshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 22 March 2012: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Kerrie Rebecca Catherine Anderson Chair 25 September 2023
None on record
Kimberley May Sellars Trustee 23 September 2024
None on record
Katherine Ann Simmonds Trustee 25 September 2023
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 11/09/2020 11/09/2021 11/09/2022 11/09/2023 11/09/2024
Total gross income £1.20k £0 £6.58k £7.08k £20.07k
Total expenditure £1.07k £2.65k £6.19k £9.69k £19.16k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 11 September 2024 20 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 11 September 2024 Not Required
Annual return 11 September 2023 13 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 11 September 2023 Not Required
Annual return 11 September 2022 16 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 11 September 2022 Not Required
Annual return 11 September 2021 23 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 11 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 11 September 2020 06 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 11 September 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Mill Lane
Mill Lane
Heighington
LINCOLN
LN4 1RQ
Phone:
01522872625