Accounts and annual returns GOING ABOUT DOING GOOD (GADG)

Charity number: 1145947
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2024 29 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2024 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2023 04 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2022 16 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2021 10 August 2022 11 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2020 08 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required