SOUTH BRENT OLD SCHOOL COMMUNITY CENTRE LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We run an open access Community Centre from which we base charitable services to the community. We directly provide lettable rooms, a community library, a community resource centre and a community archive. We host the Post Office, South Brent and District Caring, Art House, The South Brent Community Fitness centre, Moortrees and a wide range of other groups and organisations.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
60 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Devon
Governance
- 07 March 2012: Standard registration
- 04 April 2012: Funds received from 1066787 SOUTH BRENT COMMUNITY CENTRE GROUP
- SBOSCC (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ross Kennerley | Chair | 29 February 2012 |
|
|
||||
Sheila Alexander | Trustee | 05 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Sally Margaret Fairman | Trustee | 09 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Martin Sibley | Trustee | 09 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rik Meek | Trustee | 08 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
David Macdiarmid | Trustee | 11 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
Michael David Baines | Trustee | 29 February 2012 |
|
|
||||
DAVID KINROSS | Trustee | 29 February 2012 |
|
|
||||
Jane Wellens | Trustee | 29 February 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £58.34k | £52.80k | £50.75k | £56.95k | £152.75k | |
|
Total expenditure | £46.81k | £31.38k | £45.71k | £49.40k | £58.06k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £13.72k | £22.81k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 06 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 06 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 02 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 02 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 01 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 01 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 03 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 03 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 31 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 31 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 06/04/2011
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS (“OBJECTS”) ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING: THE OBJECTS OF THE COMPANY ARE TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC AND THE INHABITANTS OF SOUTH BRENT AND ITS ENVIRONS (THE "AREA OF BENEFIT") AND IN PARTICULAR TO: A) PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF SOUTH BRENT AND NEIGHBOURHOOD BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS; B) ESTABLISH, OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF, A COMMUNITY CENTRE (HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE CENTRE") AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE THE SAME (WHETHER ALONE OR IN CO-OPERATION WITH ANY STATUTORY AUTHORITY OR OTHER PERSON OR BODY) IN FURTHERANCE OF THE OBJECTS; C) TO PROMOTE SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE DETERMINED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
South Brent Old School Community Centre
Totnes Road
SOUTH BRENT
Devon
TQ10 9BP
- Phone:
- 0136472700
- Email:
- info@theoldschool.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window