Financial history REFORM RESTORE RESPECT

Charity number: 1147138
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £18.00k £39.35k £25.23k £24.51k £35.85k
Total expenditure £23.45k £26.48k £22.63k £28.63k £26.03k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £8.00k £10.86k £15.23k £500 £1.00k