TABITHA STURDY MEMORIAL TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing financial help for pupils for independent schooling
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2013
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Cambridgeshire
Governance
- 22 May 2012: Standard registration
- 13 November 2014: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2013 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2013 | 12 June 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2013 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 03/02/2012
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE BURSARIES TO ENABLE PUPILS TO ATTEND THE GROUP OF SCHOOLS STARTED BY THE STURDY FAMILY, CURRENTLY CAMBRIDGE INTERNATIONAL SCHOOL, SANCTON WOOD SCHOOL AND HOLME COURT CAMBRIDGE.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window