Trustees PUTNOE WOODS PRESCHOOL LIMITED
Charity Number: 1145918

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kieran Dimelow | Chair | 06 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jaimee Smith | Trustee | 01 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Cassie Coleman | Trustee | 22 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Julia Robinson | Trustee | 12 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lewis Janes | Trustee | 17 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Milena Kostic-Govorusa | Trustee | 06 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Clare Purcell | Trustee | 26 July 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.