SHERBORNE DOUZELAGE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Douzelage a unique, European Network. It is non- political, non-sectarian body and organises educational, cultural, sporting, tourist and economical projects and exchanges between the youth and citizens of Europe. The aim is to promote and foster the spirit of Europe and to establish links of various kinds between the towns for the mutual benefit of the inhabitants.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Other Charitable Activities
- Dorset
- Somerset
- Austria
- Belgium
- Bulgaria
- Cyprus
- Czech Republic
- Denmark
- Estonia
- Finland
- France
- Germany
- Greece
- Hungary
- Ireland
- Italy
- Latvia
- Lithuania
- Luxembourg
- Malta
- Netherlands
- Poland
- Portugal
- Romania
- Slovakia
- Slovenia
- Spain
- Sweden
Governance
- 01 June 2012: Standard registration
No other names
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Linda Ann Ashby | Trustee | 10 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL JAMES CREIGHTON BALFOUR | Trustee | 08 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL CHRISTOPHER MORRELL FCA | Trustee | 07 February 2012 |
|
|
||||
CLIFTON JELBERT | Trustee | 07 February 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.64k | £1.02k | £2.62k | £1.94k | £51.46k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.94k | £1.01k | £1.60k | £2.28k | £42.92k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 11 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 16 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 26 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 18 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 17/11/2011 AS AMENDED ON 19/04/2012
Charitable objects
THE FOLLOWING CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT WILL BE FURTHERED IN THE SHERBORNE AREA AND IN THE DOUZELAGE TOWNS IN THE EUROPEAN UNION (THE “AREA OF BENEFIT”): (A) PROMOTING CIVIC RESPONSIBILITY AND GOOD CITIZENSHIP; (B) PROMOTING VOLUNTEERING TO ACHIEVE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC (FALLING WITHIN THE DESCRIPTIONS OF PURPOSES SET OUT IN SECTION 3 OF THE CHARITIES ACT 2011); (C) ADVANCING IN LIFE, EDUCATING AND RELIEVING THE NEEDS OF YOUNG PEOPLE IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT LIMITED TO THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT AND ACTIVITIES WHICH DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES AND WHICH SHOULD ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS; (D) PROMOTING GOOD HEALTH AND PROVIDING RECREATIONAL, SPORTS AND OTHER LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT WITH THE AIM OF IMPROVING THE QUALITY OF LIVES OF PEOPLE IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT; AND (E) PROMOTING SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES (CHARITABLE UNDER ENGLISH LAW) AS THE COMMITTEE SEES FIT FROM TIME TO TIME.
Area of benefit
SHERBORNE
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 South Street
Milborne Port
Sherborne
DT9 5DH
- Phone:
- 01963251255
- Email:
- marydmc38@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window