HYNDBURN ARTS TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN THE APPRECIATION AND PRACTICE OF THE ARTS, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN THE PERFORMING, VISUAL AND NEW MEDIA ARTS. TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS, WITH A PREFERENCE TO YOUNG PERSONS UNDER THE AGE OF 25 YEARS OF AGE.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 March 2013
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Lancashire
Governance
- 17 July 2012: Standard registration
- 31 October 2014: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 31 October 2014: Funds transferred to 1158857 HYNDBURN ARTS LIMITED
- CIVIC ARTS CENTRE (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/03/2013 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £76.84k | |
|
Total expenditure | £69.85k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 March 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 March 2013 | 04 April 2014 | 64 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2013 | 05 April 2014 | 65 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 10/08/2010 AS AMENDED ON 10/03/2011 AS AMENDED ON 18/04/2012
Charitable objects
1) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN THE APPRECIATION AND PRACTICE OF THE ARTS, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN THE PERFORMING, VISUAL AND NEW MEDIA ARTS, BY ANY MEANS DEEMED APPROPRIATE BY THE TRUSTEES, INCLUDING THROUGH: - THE PROVISION AND MANAGEMENT OF THE CIVIC ARTS CENTRE, OSWALDTWISTLE; - THE PRODUCTION AND PERFORMANCE OF PLAYS, PRODUCTIONS AND SHOWS; AND - THE PROVISION OF TRAINING, WORKSHOPS AND OTHER EDUCATIONAL PROJECTS. 2) TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS, WITH A PREFERENCE TO YOUNG PERSONS UNDER THE AGE OF 25 YEARS OF AGE, WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASONS OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window